Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean Roger

Deceased

Archbishop of Narbonne, France


Events

DateEventTitle
15 May 1353AppointedBishop of Rieux, France
18 Jan 1357AppointedBishop of Carpentras, France
27 Jul 1371AppointedArchbishop of Auch, France
27 Aug 1375AppointedArchbishop of Narbonne, France
Sep 1391²DiedArchbishop of Narbonne, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Roger
Archbishop Jean Roger (died Sep 1391) Archbishop of Narbonne

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 421, and Page 168
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 121, and Page 356

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Feb 2021

Quantcast