Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Agapios Riachi (Riecji)

Deceased

Archbishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Melkite Greek), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1787Born
20 Apr 182841.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
5 Sep 182841.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
21 Mar 187891.2DiedArchbishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Melkite Greek), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Agapios Riachi (Riecji)
Archbishop Agapios Riachi (Riecji) (born 1787, died ) Archbishop of Beirut {Bairut}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKensciara

  • a bishop for 49.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,378
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1828, Number 10
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 62, Number 4,727

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast