Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Erhard von Redwitz, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany

Titular Bishop of Venecompensis


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Feb 1494AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
14 Feb 1494AppointedTitular Bishop of Venecompensis
16 Jun 1495Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Venecompensis
30 Sep 1502DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Erhard von Redwitz (VIAF: 315585762)
Bishop Erhard von Redwitz O. Cist. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz

  • a bishop for 7.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,625
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 264
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1495, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast