Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Francesco Querini

Deceased

Patriarch of Grado, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Mar 1349AppointedBishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper), Slovenia
5 Jul 1364AppointedArchbishop of Candia {Crete}, Greece
22 Dec 1367AppointedPatriarch of Grado, Italy
30 Jun 1372DiedPatriarch of Grado, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Querini
Patriarch Francesco Querini (died ) Patriarch of Grado

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Death PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Buried Place (Original)S. Maria Gloriosa dei Frari, Church, S. Maria Gloriosa dei Frari, Patriarchate of Error [S. M]

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 288, and Page 216
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 266

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 25 Jul 2021

Quantcast