Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jaime Cardinal de Portugal

Deceased

Administrator of Lisboa, Portugal

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio

Administrator of Paphos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1433Born
23 Mar 145319.5AppointedAdministrator of Arras, France
30 Apr 145319.6AppointedAdministrator of Lisboa, Portugal
17 Sep 145623.0Elevated to Cardinal
17 Sep 145623.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
18 Jun 145723.7AppointedAdministrator of Paphos, Cyprus
27 Aug 145925.9DiedAdministrator of Lisboa, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Jaime de Portugal (VIAF: 11288503)
Jaime Cardinal de Portugal (born , died ) Administrator of Lisboa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCoimbra, Diocese of Coimbra
Death PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 2.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Sep 1456
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 211, and Page 259
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 98
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1453, Number 38*
  • bp: CB, 21 Feb 2019
  • bp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Apr 2021

Quantcast