Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo di Portasole (Portasola, Porta Sole, Porta Sola), O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Grosseto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1280¹Born
1293¹13.0EnteredMember of Order of Friars Preachers
24 Apr 132545.3AppointedBishop of Sulcis, Italy
12 Feb 133050.1AppointedBishop of Grosseto, Italy
22 Feb 133454.1DiedBishop of Grosseto, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Angelo di Portasole (Portasola, Porta Sole, Porta Sola)
Bishop Angelo di Portasole (Portasola, Porta Sole, Porta Sola) O.P. (born 1280, died ) Bishop of Grosseto

EventPlace
Birth PlacePerugia
Death PlaceIstia d’Ombrone

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 269, and Page 468
  • b: CB, 18 Aug 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast