Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Teodoro Antonio Polito

Deceased

Archbishop of Corf¨, Greece


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1842Born
27 Mar 189553.1AppointedBishop of Syros (e Milos), Greece
Jun 1895²53.2Ordained BishopBishop of Syros (e Milos), Greece
11 Jun 190159.3AppointedArchbishop of Corf¨, Greece
23 Sep 191169.6DiedArchbishop of Corf¨, Greece

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Teodoro Antonio Polito
Archbishop Teodoro Antonio Polito (born , died ) Archbishop of Corf¨

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCorfu, Archdiocese of Corf¨

  • a bishop for 16.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1912
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 225, and Page 532
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1895, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast