Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Plunkett, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Meath, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1603²Born
1629²26.0Ordained PriestPriest
11 Mar 164744.1AppointedBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
29 Mar 1648³45.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
11 Jan 166966.0SelectedBishop of Meath, Ireland
8 Mar 166966.1ConfirmedBishop of Meath, Ireland
18 Nov 167976.8DiedBishop of Meath, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Patrick Plunkett
Bishop Patrick Plunkett O. Cist. (born 1603, died ) Bishop of Meath

EventPlace
Ordained BishopWaterford, Diocese of Waterford and Lismore
Death PlaceDublin, Archdiocese of Dublin
Buried Place (Original)Family Plot, Killeen

  • a priest for 50.8 years
  • a bishop for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 262
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 236, and Page 92
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1648, Number 6
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 112
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 66, Number 5,129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast