Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop St. Oliver Plunkett

Deceased

Archbishop of Armagh, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1625Born
26 Dec 165328.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
1 Jan 165428.1Ordained PriestPriest
3 Aug 166943.7AppointedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
1 Dec 166944.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
11 Jul 168155.6DiedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
23 May 1920Beatified
10 Oct 1975Canonized

MicroData Summary for St. Oliver Plunkett
Archbishop St. Oliver Plunkett (born , died ) Archbishop of Armagh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLoughcrew, Co. Meath
Ordained PriestPropaganda College, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopGent, Diocese of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
Death PlaceTyburn

  • a priest for 27.5 years
  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Catholic Encyclopedia
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1669, Number 24
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 110, and Page 111

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast