Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro Pilares, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Cagliari, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Mar 1476AppointedBishop of Dolia (Doglia), Italy
13 Jul 1484AppointedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
9 Jan 1514ResignedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Pilares
Archbishop Pietro Pilares O.P. , Archbishop Emeritus of Cagliari

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 145, and Page 114
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1476, Number 17*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast