Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerardo Pigalotti, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Arras, France


Events

DateEventTitle
3 May 1289AppointedBishop of Anagni, Italy
4 Mar 1290AppointedBishop of Spoleto, Italy
28 Mar 1295AppointedBishop of Arras, France
1316¹DiedBishop of Arras, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gerardo Pigalotti
Bishop Gerardo Pigalotti O.P. (died 1316) Bishop of Arras

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 115, and Page 461
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 86

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Mar 2021

Quantcast