Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Philip Phillips

Deceased

Archbishop of Tuam, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1716¹Born
1742²26.0Ordained PriestPriest
18 Nov 176044.8SelectedBishop of Killala, Ireland
24 Nov 176044.8ConfirmedBishop of Killala, Ireland
1761²45.0Ordained BishopBishop of Killala, Ireland
1 Jul 177660.5AppointedBishop of Achonry, Ireland
22 Nov 178569.8AppointedArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland
26 Sep 178771.7DiedArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Philip Phillips
Archbishop Philip Phillips (born 1716, died ) Archbishop of Tuam

EventPlace
Death PlaceClonmore
Buried Place (Original)Family Vault, Urlaur, Abbey

  • a priest for 45.7 years
  • a bishop for 26.7 years

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,525
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 63, and Page 77
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 420
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1761, Number 40
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 113, and Page 114

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast