Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jaime Perez de Valencia, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain

Titular Bishop of Christopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1408²Born
30 May 143628.4ProfessedMember of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
1 Oct 146860.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain
1 Oct 146860.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Christopolis
12 Feb 146961.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Christopolis
3 Aug 149082.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jaime Perez de Valencia (VIAF: 12339922)
Bishop Jaime Perez de Valencia O.S.A. (born 1408, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Valencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAyora, Diocese of Valencia
Ordained BishopCathedral, Valencia, Diocese of Valencia

  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1469, Number 1
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 308, Number 194

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast