Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Peng Weizhao

Auxiliary Bishop of Nanchang [Nanchang], China

Note(s): (Aux/Jiangxi)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1966² Born
1989²23.0Ordained PriestPriest
2012²46.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Yujiang [YŁkiang], China
2014²48.0AppointedBishop of Yujiang [YŁkiang], China
10 Apr 201448.2Ordained BishopBishop of Yujiang [YŁkiang], China
24 Nov 202256.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Nanchang [Nanchang], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johannes Peng Weizhao
(WikiData: Q49079961)
Bishop Johannes Peng Weizhao (born 1966) Auxiliary Bishop of Nanchang [Nanchang]

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Nanchang [Nanchang].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Dec 2019
  • b: Clandestine Episcopal Ordinations in China, Year 2018, Number 107
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Number 18,301
  • ab: CB, 24 Nov 2022
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Nov 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024