Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Andrea Matteo Cardinal Palmieri

Deceased

Administrator of Policastro, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Clemente


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1493Born
30 Jul 151824.9AppointedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
21 Nov 152734.2Elevated to Cardinal
21 Nov 152734.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
21 Aug 152835.0ResignedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
24 May 152935.7AppointedAdministrator of Sarno, Italy
1530²36.3AppointedAdministrator of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
24 Aug 153037.0ResignedAdministrator of Sarno, Italy
21 Jun 153137.8ResignedAdministrator of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
5 Jul 153238.9AppointedAdministrator of Sarno, Italy
24 Apr 153440.7ResignedAdministrator of Sarno, Italy
20 Aug 153441.0AppointedAdministrator of Lucera, Italy
26 Feb 153541.5ResignedAdministrator of Lucera, Italy
14 Jun 153541.8AppointedAdministrator of Conza, Italy
5 Jul 153541.9AppointedAdministrator of Policastro, Italy
16 Jul 153541.9ResignedAdministrator of Conza, Italy
20 Jan 153743.4DiedAdministrator of Policastro, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrea Matteo Palmieri
Andrea Matteo Cardinal Palmieri (born , died ) Administrator of Policastro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 9.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 21 Nov 1527
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 229, and Page 175
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 293, and Page 94
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 277
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1518, Number 28*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast