Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Géraud de Palayrac

Deceased

Bishop of Sarlat, France


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Nov 1372AppointedBishop of Spoleto, Italy
1379¹ResignedBishop of Spoleto, Italy
28 Feb 1396AppointedBishop of Sarlat, France
21 Feb 1397DiedBishop of Sarlat, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Géraud de Palayrac
Bishop Géraud de Palayrac (died ) Bishop of Sarlat

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 436, and Page 461

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 22 Feb 2021

Quantcast