Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John O’Mollony

Deceased

Bishop of Limerick, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1617²Born
1642²25.0Ordained PriestPriest
12 May 167154.3SelectedBishop of Killaloe, Ireland
26 May 167154.4ConfirmedBishop of Killaloe, Ireland
6 Mar 167255.1Ordained BishopBishop of Killaloe, Ireland
24 Jan 168972.0AppointedBishop of Limerick, Ireland
3 Sep 170285.6DiedBishop of Limerick, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John O’Mollony
Bishop John O’Mollony (born 1617, died ) Bishop of Limerick

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKillaloe, Diocese of Killaloe
Buried Place (Original)Collège des Lombards

  • a priest for 60.6 years
  • a bishop for 30.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 236, and Page 244
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1672, Number 8
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 101, and Page 102

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast