Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Maurice O’Kelly

Deceased

Archbishop of Tuam, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Mar 1378AppointedBishop of Clonfert, Ireland
27 Jan 1393AppointedArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland
29 Sep 1409DiedArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Maurice O’Kelly
Archbishop Maurice O’Kelly (died ) Archbishop of Tuam

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 500, and Page 193

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast