Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michael O’Gara

Deceased

Archbishop of Tuam, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Aug 1740SelectedArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland
19 Sep 1740ConfirmedArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland
12 Feb 1749DiedArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Michael O’Gara
Archbishop Michael O’Gara (died ) Archbishop of Tuam

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 420
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1740, Number 21
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 98

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast