Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Jaime Cesar Ortiz de Lazcano Piquer

Priest of Roma {Rome}, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1969 Born
25 Apr 199929.7Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
21 Sep 201849.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of San Felipe, Chile
15 Aug 202051.0CeasedApostolic Administrator of San Felipe, Chile

MicroData Summary for Jaime Cesar Ortiz de Lazcano Piquer
Father Jaime Cesar Ortiz de Lazcano Piquer (born ) Priest of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlacePamplona, Archdiocese of Pamplona y Tudela, Spain
Ordained PriestSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Roma {Rome}.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 21 Sep 2018
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Sep 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Jun 2021

Quantcast