Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John O’Carroll

Deceased

Archbishop of Cashel, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Jun 1302AppointedBishop of Cork, Ireland
20 Feb 1321AppointedBishop of Meath, Ireland
19 Jan 1327AppointedArchbishop of Cashel, Ireland
Aug 1329³DiedArchbishop of Cashel, Ireland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John O’Carroll
Archbishop John O’Carroll (died Aug 1329) Archbishop of Cashel

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 170, and Page 338
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 211

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 2 Dec 2020

Quantcast