Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas

Deceased

Bishop of Nola, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Apr 1319AppointedBishop of Bisignano, Italy
22 Apr 1319Ordained BishopBishop of Bisignano, Italy
22 Oct 1331AppointedBishop of Nola, Italy
1340²DiedBishop of Nola, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolas
Bishop Nicolas (died 1340) Bishop of Nola

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon, Diocese of Avignon, France

  • a bishop for 20.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 136, and Page 370
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,838

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast