Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bernardo Cardinal Navagero

Deceased

Former Administrator of Verona, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1507Born
26 Feb 156154.1Elevated to Cardinal
2 Jun 156154.4AppointedCardinal-Priest
3 Jun 156154.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Nicola fra le Immagini
6 Jul 156255.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio
31 Aug 156255.6ResignedCardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio
15 Sep 156255.7AppointedAdministrator of Verona, Italy
7 Feb 156558.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna
13 Apr 156558.2DiedFormer Administrator of Verona, Italy
15 May 156558.3ResignedAdministrator of Verona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Navagero
Bernardo Cardinal Navagero (born 1507, died ) Former Administrator of Verona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}

  • a cardinal for 4.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Feb 1561
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 331

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast