Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pierre Cardinal de Mortemart (Gauvain)

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Jun 1322AppointedBishop of Viviers (Aps), France
7 Oct 1325AppointedBishop of Auxerre, France
18 Dec 1327AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio
18 Dec 1327Elevated to Cardinal
Jan 1328³AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro
14 Apr 1335DiedCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre de Mortemart (Gauvain)
Pierre Cardinal de Mortemart (Gauvain) (died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMortemart, Diocese of Limoges, France
Death PlaceAvignon
Buried Place (Original)Church, Mortemart, Diocese of Limoges, France

  • a cardinal for 7.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 533, and Page 120
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1327

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Feb 2021

Quantcast