Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pectin Cardinal de Montesquieu

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Jun 1325AppointedBishop of Bazas, France
12 Sep 1334AppointedBishop of Maguelonne, France
27 Jan 1339AppointedBishop of Albi, France
17 Dec 1350AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli
17 Dec 1350Elevated to Cardinal
1 Feb 1355DiedCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli

MicroData Summary for Pectin de Montesquieu
Pectin Cardinal de Montesquieu (died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArchdiocese of Auch, France
Buried Place (Original)Maguelonne, Diocese of Maguelonne, France

  • a cardinal for 4.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 320, and Page 81
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 516
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Dec 1350

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 1 Mar 2021

Quantcast