Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaspar Antonio del Monte

Deceased

Bishop of Civitate (CittÓ or Civita), Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Apr 1517AppointedTitular Bishop of Bethleem
21 Aug 1517AppointedBishop of Civitate (CittÓ or Civita), Italy
25 Jan 1519Ordained BishopBishop of Civitate (CittÓ or Civita), Italy
1545¹DiedBishop of Civitate (CittÓ or Civita), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gaspar Antonio del Monte
Bishop Gaspar Antonio del Monte (died 1545) Bishop of Civitate (CittÓ or Civita)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSte Praxade, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 25.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 168, and Page 133
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1519, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast