Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mario Montani

Deceased

Bishop of Nocera Umbra, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
25 Jun 1646AppointedBishop of Nocera Umbra, Italy
22 Jul 1646Ordained BishopBishop of Nocera Umbra, Italy
31 Dec 1668DiedBishop of Nocera Umbra, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mario Montani
Bishop Mario Montani (died ) Bishop of Nocera Umbra

EventPlace
Ordained BishopVallicella, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 262
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1646, Number 13
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 71, Number 5,629

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast