Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Víctor Manuel Montero Carvallo, SS.CC. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Tarapacá, Chile

Priest of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1867Born
1888²20.9ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
29 Feb 189629.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
31 Aug 190639.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tarapacá, Chile
2 Jan 190739.9ResignedVicar Apostolic of Tarapacá, Chile
15 Jul 195285.4DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Tarapacá, Chile

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Víctor Manuel Montero Carvallo
Father Víctor Manuel Montero Carvallo SS.CC. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Tarapacá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago de Chile, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Death PlaceSantiago de Chile, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile

  • a priest for 56.3 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 5 Apr 2021

Quantcast