Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Monaldeschi

Deceased

Bishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Apr 1418AppointedBishop of Orvieto, Italy
6 Sep 1443AppointedBishop of Teramo, Italy
25 Sep 1450AppointedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
1461²DiedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Monaldeschi
Bishop Francesco Monaldeschi (died 1461) Bishop of Ascoli Piceno

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 509
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 90, and Page 96

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 May 2021

Quantcast