Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Estęvão Mingučis, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cuenca, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Feb 1310AppointedBishop of Porto, Portugal
8 Oct 1313AppointedBishop of Lisboa, Portugal
21 Aug 1322AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
4 Jan 1326DiedBishop of Cuenca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Estęvão Mingučis
Bishop Estęvão Mingučis O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Cuenca

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 21 Feb 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast