Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Godfried van Mierlo, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Haarlem, Netherlands

Auxiliary Bishop of Münster


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1518Born
153415.9ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
154223.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
4 Mar 157052.0SelectedBishop of Haarlem, Netherlands
11 Dec 157052.8ConfirmedBishop of Haarlem, Netherlands
11 Feb 157153.0Ordained BishopBishop of Haarlem, Netherlands
29 May 157860.3ResignedBishop of Haarlem, Netherlands
14 Mar 158264.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
28 Jul 158769.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Haarlem, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Godfried van Mierlo (VIAF: 314791111)
Bishop Godfried van Mierlo O.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Haarlem

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHelmond
Ordained BishopS. Paul, Anvers, Diocese of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium
Death PlaceDeventer, Diocese of Deventer

  • a priest for 45.5 years
  • a bishop for 16.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1571, Number 2
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 208
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 46, Number 3,088

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 30 Nov 2020

Quantcast