Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludovico Michelio

Deceased

Bishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Dec 1583AppointedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
24 Jun 1584Ordained BishopBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
27 Apr 1590DiedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy

MicroData Summary for Ludovico Michelio
Bishop Ludovico Michelio (died ) Bishop of Alba (Pompea)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMantova, Diocese of Mantova
Ordained BishopDuomo, Cathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Death PlaceAlba, Diocese of Alba (Pompea)

  • a bishop for 5.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 100
  • ob/c2: CB, 16 Sep 2011
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1584, Number 11
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 87, Number 7,233
  • c34/loc: AT, 27 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 28 Feb 2021

Quantcast