Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Raimond de Mévouillon, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Embrun, France


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Jun 1282AppointedBishop of Gap, France
4 Oct 1289AppointedArchbishop of Embrun, France
28 Jun 1294DiedArchbishop of Embrun, France

MicroData Summary for Raimond de Mévouillon
Archbishop Raimond de Mévouillon O.P. (died ) Archbishop of Embrun

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 514, and Page 234

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 4 Mar 2021

Quantcast