Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Johann von Metzenhausen

Deceased

Archbishop of Trier, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1492Born
27 Mar 153139.2SelectedArchbishop of Trier, Germany
27 Nov 153139.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Trier, Germany
16 Mar 153240.2Ordained PriestPriest
17 Mar 153240.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Trier, Germany
22 Jul 154048.5DiedArchbishop of Trier, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann von Metzenhausen (VIAF: 5738878)
Archbishop Johann von Metzenhausen (born 1492, died ) Archbishop of Trier

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNeef
Ordained BishopTrier, Archdiocese of Trier

  • a priest for 8.3 years
  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,817
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1532, Number 3
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 317
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 54, Number 3,845

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast