Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Alfonso Mendes, S.J. †

Deceased

Patriarch of Ethiopia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1579¹Born
1593²14.0ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
19 Dec 162243.9AppointedPatriarch of Ethiopia
12 Mar 162344.1Ordained BishopPatriarch of Ethiopia
29 Jun 165980.4DiedPatriarch of Ethiopia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Mendes
Patriarch Alfonso Mendes S.J. (born 1579, died ) Patriarch of Ethiopia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEvora, Archdiocese of Évora, Portugal
Ordained BishopSt. Roch, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
Death PlaceGoa

  • a bishop for 36.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 71
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1623, Number 9
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 77, Number 6,170
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 87, Number 7,285

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast