Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Artaud de Melan

Deceased

Bishop of Grasse, France

Bishop of Arles


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Jul 1372AppointedBishop of Forli, Italy
May 1378²AppointedBishop of Grasse, France
2 May 1382AppointedBishop of Sisteron, France
17 Dec 1404AppointedBishop of Arles, France
1 Nov 1410DiedBishop of Arles, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Artaud de Melan
Bishop Artaud de Melan (died ) Bishop of Grasse

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 267, and Page 253
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 454, and Page 104

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast