Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dietrich von Meißen

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Merseburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1162Born
3 May 120341.1AppointedBishop of Merseburg, Germany
19 Sep 120442.5Ordained BishopBishop of Merseburg, Germany
Oct 1215³53.5ResignedBishop of Merseburg, Germany
18 Jan 122158.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Merseburg, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Dietrich von Meißen
Bishop Dietrich von Meißen (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Merseburg

EventPlace
Ordained BishopHildesheim, Diocese of Hildesheim

  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 336
  • b/c2: CB, 3 Feb 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast