Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Teige McCarthy Rabagh

Deceased

Bishop of Cork and Cloyne, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1664¹Born
17 Aug 172662.6SelectedBishop of Cork and Cloyne, Ireland
7 Apr 172763.2ConfirmedBishop of Cork and Cloyne, Ireland
Jul 1727³63.5Ordained BishopBishop of Cork and Cloyne, Ireland
20 Aug 174783.6DiedBishop of Cork and Cloyne, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Teige McCarthy Rabagh
Bishop Teige McCarthy Rabagh (born 1664, died ) Bishop of Cork and Cloyne

EventPlace
Buried Place (Original)Old Graveyard, St. Mary's, Shandon

  • a bishop for 20.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1727, Number 64
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 172
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 65, and Page 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast