Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Terence MacMahon (McMahon)

Deceased

Bishop of Killaloe, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1666²Born
19 Aug 169630.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
24 Aug 169630.6Ordained PriestPriest
25 Nov 172458.8SelectedBishop of Killaloe, Ireland
16 Dec 172458.9ConfirmedBishop of Killaloe, Ireland
1725¹59.0Ordained BishopBishop of Killaloe, Ireland
1728¹62.0DiedBishop of Killaloe, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Terence MacMahon (McMahon)
Bishop Terence MacMahon (McMahon) (born 1666, died 1728) Bishop of Killaloe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceClenagh

  • a priest for 31.3 years
  • a bishop for 3.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 236
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1725, Number 59
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 76

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast