Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ross Roe MacMahon (McMahon)

Deceased

Archbishop of Armagh, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1698¹Born
24 Feb 172527.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
31 Mar 172527.2Ordained PriestPriest
13 May 173840.3SelectedBishop of Clogher, Ireland
17 May 173840.3ConfirmedBishop of Clogher, Ireland
27 Aug 1738³40.6Ordained BishopBishop of Clogher, Ireland
19 Jul 174749.5SelectedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
3 Aug 174749.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
29 Oct 174850.8DiedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ross Roe MacMahon (McMahon)
Archbishop Ross Roe MacMahon (McMahon) (born 1698, died ) Archbishop of Armagh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEnagh, Co. Monaghan
Buried Place (Original)Churchyard, Edergole

  • a priest for 23.5 years
  • a bishop for 10.1 years

Source(s):
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,022
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 100, and Page 170
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1738, Number 40
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 76

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast