Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Donagh McCarthy

Deceased

Bishop of Cork and Cloyne, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1654²Born
1674²20.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jul 171258.5AppointedBishop of Cork and Cloyne, Ireland
27 Aug 171359.6Ordained BishopBishop of Cork and Cloyne, Ireland
Mar 1726²72.1DiedBishop of Cork and Cloyne, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Donagh McCarthy
Bishop Donagh McCarthy (born 1654, died Mar 1726) Bishop of Cork and Cloyne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMuskerry
Ordained PriestQuimpercorentine
Ordained BishopSpringhouse, Glen of Aherlow
Buried Place (Original)St. Mary's, Old, Cemetery, Shandon

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,465
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1713, Number 14
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 172
  • ob: CB, 14 Dec 2015
  • op: Website of the Diocese, 25 Apr 2016
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 60, Number 4,485
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 64, and Page 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast