Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Florence MacCarthy

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Cork, Ireland

Titular Bishop of AntinoŽ


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1762²Born
19 Feb 178523.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland
12 Mar 178523.1Ordained PriestPriest of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland
1787²25.0IncardinatedPriest of Cork, Ireland
6 Mar 180341.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Cork, Ireland
6 Mar 180341.1AppointedTitular Bishop of AntinoŽ
1804²42.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of AntinoŽ
17 Jun 181048.4DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Cork, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Florence MacCarthy
Bishop Florence MacCarthy (born 1762, died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Cork

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMacroom, Co. Cork
Buried Place (Original)Chapel yard, St. Finbarr's

  • a priest for 25.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1803, Number 17
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 79, and Page 162
  • b: Website of the Diocese, 25 Apr 2016
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 65
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 75, Number 5,991

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast