Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Carlo Mauri

Deceased

Substitute (Sostituto) of the Secretariat of State


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1761Born
3 Aug 181452.7AppointedSubstitute (Sostituto) of the Secretariat of State
2 Feb 183068.2DiedSubstitute (Sostituto) of the Secretariat of State

MicroData Summary for Carlo Mauri
Father Carlo Mauri (born , died ) Substitute (Sostituto) of State

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFilaciano, Diocese of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Source(s):
  • b/xsta: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast