Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kazmierz z Książąt Mazowiecki (von Masowien)

Deceased

Bishop of Płock, Poland


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Jun 1471SelectedBishop of Płock, Poland
16 Dec 1471ConfirmedBishop of Płock, Poland
10 Sep 1475Ordained BishopBishop of Płock, Poland
9 Jun 1480DiedBishop of Płock, Poland

MicroData Summary for Kazmierz z Książąt Mazowiecki (von Masowien)
Bishop Kazmierz z Książąt Mazowiecki (von Masowien) (died ) Bishop of Płock

EventPlace
Ordained BishopChurch, Pultusk

  • a bishop for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 217
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,368
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1477, Number 7
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 241, Number 20,193

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast