Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop NicolÚ Mascardi

Deceased

Bishop of Accia and Mariana, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1546²Born
30 Jan 157933.0AppointedBishop of Brugnato, Italy
22 Mar 157933.2Ordained BishopBishop of Brugnato, Italy
9 Apr 158438.2AppointedBishop of Accia and Mariana, France
1591²45.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
1592¹46.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
21 Sep 159953.7DiedBishop of Accia and Mariana, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for NicolÚ Mascardi (VIAF: 89217272)
Bishop NicolÚ Mascardi (born 1546, died ) Bishop of Accia and Mariana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSarzana, Diocese of Luni e Sarzana, Italy
Ordained BishopMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Death PlaceBastia, Diocese of Accia and Mariana

  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 141, and Page 235
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 272
  • b: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1579, Number 8*
  • b/ob/c2+/d: AT, 9 Sep 2019
  • b/ob/c2+/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 241, Number 20,194

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast