Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Giambattista Maoletti, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Houkouang, China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1667²Born
3 Aug 168821.5ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
1721²54.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Houkouang, China
14 Jan 172558.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Houkouang, China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giambattista Maoletti
Father Giambattista Maoletti O.F.M. (born 1667, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Houkouang

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSerravalle, Diocese of Vercelli, Italy
Death PlaceLuo-kuo-ma or Malukou

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast