Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Malvoisine, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
1200²AppointedBishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
24 Sep 1200Ordained BishopBishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
20 Sep 1202³AppointedBishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain
9 Jul 1238DiedBishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for William Malvoisine
Bishop William Malvoisine O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Saint Andrews

EventPlace
Ordained BishopLyon, Archdiocese of Lyon, France
Death PlaceInchemordauch
Buried Place (Original)New Church of St. Andrews

  • a bishop for 37.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 88, and Page 264
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 94, Number 7,938

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 22 Nov 2020

Quantcast