Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Guy Cardinal de Malsec

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Administrator of Agde


Events

DateEventTitle
12 May 1370AppointedBishop of Lodève, France
9 Apr 1371AppointedBishop of Poitiers, France
20 Dec 1375AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme
20 Dec 1375Elevated to Cardinal
21 Nov 1383AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
8 Jun 1409AppointedAdministrator of Agde, France
8 Mar 1411DiedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Note(s): ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Guy de Malsec
Guy Cardinal de Malsec (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTulle, Diocese of Tulle, France

  • a cardinal for 35.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Dec 1375
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 399, and Page 310

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 24 Feb 2021

Quantcast