Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lodovico Malaspina, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1626Born
20 Jul 164216.0ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
8 Feb 167245.6AppointedBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
25 Feb 167245.6Ordained BishopBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
5 Sep 169569.2DiedBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy

MicroData Summary for Lodovico Malaspina
Bishop Lodovico Malaspina O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePonte
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 131
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1672, Number 5
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 71, Number 5,653

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast