Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philip MacDevitt

Deceased

Bishop of Derry, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1725²Born
1752²27.0Ordained PriestPriest
21 Dec 176540.9SelectedBishop of Derry, Ireland
14 Jan 176641.0ConfirmedBishop of Derry, Ireland
24 Nov 179772.8DiedBishop of Derry, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Philip MacDevitt
Bishop Philip MacDevitt (born 1725, died ) Bishop of Derry

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCrislagh, Inishowen, Co. Donegal
Death PlaceClaudy
Buried Place (Original)Churchyard, Fahan parish, Inishowen

  • a priest for 45.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 194
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1766, Number 48
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 67, and Page 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast